Financial history HONING AND CROSTWIGHT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1015542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £6.35k £12.53k £11.71k £5.80k £14.30k
Total expenditure £5.80k £4.33k £5.55k £6.25k £16.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.10k N/A £7.73k