Accounts and annual returns MEDICAL AID FOR IRAQ
Charity number: 1015623
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 22 September 2010 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 22 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 18 August 2008 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 19 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window