Accounts and annual returns RENATE CAMPBELL TRUST

Charity number: 1015840
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 03 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 25 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 27 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required