Accounts and annual returns THE RENAISSANCE SINGERS

Charity number: 1015930
Charity reporting is up to date (236 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 February 2025 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 December 2023 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 September 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required