Accounts and annual returns PENDLETON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1016011
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 19 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 21 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 07 July 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required