Accounts and annual returns MARLOW COMMON WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 12 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 20 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 06 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 22 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 24 February 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required