Accounts and annual returns INTER AGENCY DAY CARE GROUP OXFORD

Charity number: 1016058
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 13 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 05 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 05 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 23 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 23 July 2004 On Time