Financial history IDEAS PLUS

Charity number: 1016182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £786.91k £890.30k £945.46k £1.09m £1.25m
Total expenditure £645.52k £842.63k £888.19k £959.03k £1.08m
Income from government contracts N/A £851.32k £935.57k £955.92k £1.20m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1 £3 £50 £0 £50.18k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £785.89k £889.47k £944.94k £1.09m £1.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01k £826 £467 £471 £365
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £645.52k £842.63k £888.00k £959.03k £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.53k £16.10k £11.61k £82.91k £14.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £190 £0 £0