Governing document HADFIELD INSTITUTE LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 8 NOVEMBER 1992, 16 AUGUST 2006 AND 2 MARCH 2007. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 4 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON PROVIDING ACCESS TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE, BY REASON OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE, OTHERWISE UNABLE TO GAIN SUCH ACCESS 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE SO AS TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND POTENTIAL OF INDIVIDUALS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY 3. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND TRAINING TO UNEMPLOYED INDIVIDUALS CONCERNING EMPLOYMENT AND SELF EMPLOYMENT AND THE PROVISION OF CV WRITING, JOB SEARCH AND JOB CLUB FACILITIES FOR THEM
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.