Financial history PICKWELL AND LEESTHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1016203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.64k £39.84k £6.94k £4.07k £3.65k
Total expenditure £3.30k £2.54k £2.82k £10.75k £19.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.67k N/A N/A N/A