Accounts and annual returns HARTLEY HARE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1016335
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 September 2019 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 25 September 2019 87 days late
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 June 2018 On Time