Financial history TUNE-UP CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1016351
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £579 £769 £275 £260 £221
Total expenditure £3.80k £900 £800 £800 £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A