Accounts and annual returns ASH FIELD SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1016385
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 21 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 21 January 2013 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 07 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required