Financial history NEWBOROUGH AND BOROUGH FEN CORONATION PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 1016530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1 £20.24k £229.61k £3.99k £3.47k
Total expenditure £514 £16.15k £21.88k £8.50k £9.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.24k £8.00k N/A N/A