Financial history KINGSTON COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1016578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.28k £3.38k £3.39k £5.04k £11.30k
Total expenditure £9.54k £2.85k £2.85k £7.39k £9.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A