Financial history LA MOTTE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1016602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.01k £4.72k £5.04k £5.55k £6.10k
Total expenditure £2.07k £0 £0 £2.60k £20.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A