Trustees WHEELOCK PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1016691

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Jan Harrison | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel King | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Abigail Thomas | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Porter | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Chorlton | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil John Charles Pointon | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann ROBERTSON | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.