Accounts and annual returns GERTRUDE ALICE MAJOR FUND

Charity number: 1016954
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2011 17 May 2012 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 16 June 2011 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 23 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 05 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required