Accounts and annual returns MATERIALS AND TOY STORE

Charity Number: 1017316
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 February 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 20 February 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 20 February 2008 15 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2008 Not Required
Annual return 20 February 2007 02 September 2008 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2007 Not Required
Annual return 20 February 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2006 Not submitted