Financial history THE MITCHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1017596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.77k £1.11k £613 £1.11k £3.51k
Total expenditure £17.73k £141 £250 £15.25k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A