Financial history HIFZUL QURAN AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1017772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £24.20k £73.82k £50.37k £62.42k £69.76k
Total expenditure £45.56k £36.84k £56.35k £60.38k £49.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.44k £4.78k N/A N/A