Financial history WIGHTCARE SUPPORT GROUP

Charity Number: 1017802
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/03/2005 23/03/2006 13/07/2007 13/07/2008 13/07/2009
Total gross income £10 £0 £1.38k £0 £0
Total expenditure £252 £524 £19 £28 £28
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A