Accounts and annual returns KENDAL CASTLE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1018012
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 05 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 29 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 19 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 17 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 18 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required