Accounts and annual returns FAILAND WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1018256
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 18 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 11 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 16 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 21 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required