Accounts and annual returns BICKLEIGH (PLYMOUTH) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1018450
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2007 06 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 10 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 14 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required