Accounts and annual returns LINK LEISURE

Charity number: 1018635
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 01 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 21 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 21 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 04 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time