Financial history ESTON GRANGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1018879
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £4.53k £3.37k £1.54k £1.57k £1.33k
Total expenditure £4.90k £3.36k £1.87k £1.43k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A