Financial history ADEPT COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY LIMITED

Charity number: 1018919
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £433.54k £300.83k £381.08k £139.53k £91.30k
Total expenditure £506.78k £380.12k £337.45k £162.58k £116.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A