Financial history TERLING SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1018951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.75k £4.42k £2.12k £12.78k £7.52k
Total expenditure £3.22k £3.58k £2.60k £9.68k £8.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.00k N/A