Accounts and annual returns ST PETERS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1019291
Charity reporting is up to date (277 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 04 April 2025 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 04 April 2025 277 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2022 03 July 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 03 July 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 28 September 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 28 September 2020 89 days late Download Open in new window