Financial history HILLIARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1019882
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £27 £27 £26 £35 £66
Total expenditure £0 £250 £0 £500 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A