Accounts and annual returns CHERRY TREE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1019937
Charity reporting is up to date (248 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 February 2025 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 June 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 June 2023 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 June 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window