Accounts and annual returns HOLYWELL HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1019960
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 14 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 14 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 14 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 14 October 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2004 Not submitted