Accounts and annual returns Friends of Stover Country Park

Charity number: 1020029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required