Accounts and annual returns CARMEL CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1020072
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 19 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 26 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 26 November 2004 On Time