Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BEALINGS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1020472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 October 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2023 19 January 2025 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2022 23 May 2024 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2021 23 May 2024 642 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2020 23 May 2024 1007 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2020 Not Required