Accounts and annual returns BRIDGNORTH LITTLE LEARNERS

Charity Number: 1020640
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 14 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 09 February 2009 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 25 February 2009 25 days late
Annual return 30 April 2007 14 March 2008 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2005 14 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 14 February 2006 On Time