Accounts and annual returns TWYFORD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1020754
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 06 May 2015 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 21 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required