Financial history HYDE PARK JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1020802
Charity reporting is overdue by 1764 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £11.55k £13.11k £5.80k £5.84k £10.40k
Total expenditure £23.82k £8.99k £8.28k £10.61k £10.82k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A