Financial history THE BEVIS MARKS SYNAGOGUE TRUST

Charity number: 1021444
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £72 £490 £5.00k £47 £70
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £4.65k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A