Trustees HARROWBARROW AND METHERELL PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1021597

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Smith | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Waring | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Waring | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Dilks | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marley | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacques Roberts | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Henderson | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Warne | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ferguson | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.