Accounts and annual returns LADBROKE AND DEPPERS BRIDGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1021736
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 09 August 2008 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 11 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 28 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 06 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required