Financial history GRANGE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1021868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.40k £825 £2.15k £2.75k £7.38k
Total expenditure £3.49k £2.87k £1.86k £2.67k £9.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A