Trustees PINCHBECK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1021907

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET MOYSES | Chair | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lucette Preston | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jen Wenham | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jude Holmes | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Greetham | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Barker Mrs | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Wells | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Wood | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY BRABAN | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE WHITE | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BRADSHAW | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOAN TWYMAN | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.