Accounts and annual returns COLERNE OLD SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1021960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window