Financial history BEECHES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022286
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £87.10k £74.91k £80.09k £66.86k £71.25k
Total expenditure £78.96k £73.54k £76.33k £74.93k £76.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £59.23k £51.17k £2.00k £2.00k £51.95k