Financial history EAST-THE-WATER STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022769
Charity reporting is up to date (298 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £254.18k £213.77k £172.44k £184.43k £203.55k
Total expenditure £266.75k £203.71k £182.12k £183.30k £203.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A