Accounts and annual returns ST CATHERINES KINDERGARTEN

Charity number: 1022781
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2015 27 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 01 August 2015 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 03 August 2015 34 days late
Annual return 31 August 2013 24 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 24 June 2014 On Time