Accounts and annual returns FAMILY EDUCATION DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1022814
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 05 February 2010 190 days late
Annual return 30 September 2007 04 December 2008 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 05 December 2008 128 days late