Accounts and annual returns BEACONSFIELD OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1023030
Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 05 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 09 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 20 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required